CO HJR1004 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change Joint Rules Interim Cmts & Capitalization
Title
Change Joint Rules Interim Cmts & Capitalization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-02-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-02-05 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-02-04 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-02-03 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - Floor |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - Floor |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 01/29/2014 - Floor |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2014-01-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-01-21 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - Floor |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |