CO HJR1004 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
Summary
Oppose Forest Service Water Permit Reqmnt
Title
Oppose Forest Service Water Permit Reqmnt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer HJR13-1004 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer HJR13-1004 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer HJR13-1004 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2013-02-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-01 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-01-28 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |