CO HB1422 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the cost threshold of controlled maintenance projects for capital renewal.
Title
Capital Renewal Project Cost Threshold
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1422, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1422 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1422, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1422 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-18 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2024-04-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2024-04-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2024-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |