CO HB1421 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the procurement process for major information technology projects undertaken by state agencies, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Procurement Process For Major IT Information Technology Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1421 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1421 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1421 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1421 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1421, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1421 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1421 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1421 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1421 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1421, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/03/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-01 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |