CO HB1420 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the adjustment of certain state tax expenditures in order to allocate additional revenues to the state education fund, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Adjust Tax Expenditures For State Education Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.069) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.034 (Attachment D). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.064 (Attachment E). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1420, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1420, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1420, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.031) (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.043) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.006) (Y: 32 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.016) (Y: 26 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.013) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.019) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.020) (Y: 28 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 30 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 22 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.021) (Y: 25 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.022) (Y: 30 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.025) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.025) (Y: 25 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1420, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1420, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.069) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.034 (Attachment D). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.064 (Attachment E). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1420, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1420, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1420, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.031) (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.043) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.006) (Y: 32 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.016) (Y: 26 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.013) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.019) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.020) (Y: 28 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 30 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 22 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.021) (Y: 25 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.022) (Y: 30 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.025) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.025) (Y: 25 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1420, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1420, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-11 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-06-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-09 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-06-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |