CO HB1420 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of special districts to provide early childhood development services.
Title
Early Childhood Development Special District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1420 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.001) (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1420 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.001) (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1420 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |