CO HB1418 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the financing of public schools, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing appropriations.
Title
Public School Finance
Sponsors
Rep. KC Becker [D] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1418, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1418 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1418, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1418, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1418 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1418 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1418, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1418 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1418, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1418, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1418 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1418 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-12 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-06 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |