CO HB1404 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the sex offender management board, and, in connection therewith, delaying consideration of the recommendations of the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies until the 2021 regular session.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Delay Sex Offender Management Board Review

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1404 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1404 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Governor Signed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-08SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-05-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1404
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1404_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1404_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1404_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1404_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1404_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1404_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bb0de02f03039d058725857c00645170-hb20-1404-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1404vote057d46
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/809c67087751d52887258582000c9191-hb20-1404-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1404vote543e4e

Bill Comments

feedback