CO HB1392 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Internet Sweepstakes Cafes Simulated Gambling
Title
Internet Sweepstakes Cafes Simulated Gambling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1392 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1392, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1392, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2014-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |