CO HB1387 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revision Of All Capital Related Statutes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revision Of All Capital Related Statutes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment I) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1387, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1387, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1387, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06HouseGovernor Signed
2014-05-21HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-20HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-06HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2014-05-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2014-04-30SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2014-04-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-24HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-04-23HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-04-21HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/770ED06D773F684487257C300005C69B?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/770ED06D773F684487257C300005C69B/$FILE/1387_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/770ED06D773F684487257C300005C69B/$FILE/1387sa_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/770ED06D773F684487257C300005C69B/$FILE/1387_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/770ED06D773F684487257C300005C69B/$FILE/1387_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/770ED06D773F684487257C300005C69B/$FILE/1387ssta_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/770ED06D773F684487257C300005C69B/$FILE/1387_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/770ED06D773F684487257C300005C69B/$FILE/1387_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/770ED06D773F684487257C300005C69B/$FILE/1387_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A0679C2617E555CD87257CC30066A040
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F31CDA06716DBC2D87257CC50065B4AA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F8F328E7822B2F0487257CC500656DA4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/20339C0793FDC7AF87257CC500658AB7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8A5F6D4A41C906C287257CCA0081EA3E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A94E143BE8F1E10F87257CCA0081BF6F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/82FB3876C4F7C10A87257CCA0081C2C6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7D0F8EFEB6B1DB5687257CCA0081BBEE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/16BA1605823DD5C587257CCA0081CE6D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/145B76CF5D8D1E9D87257CCA0081C6B8

Bill Comments

feedback