CO HB1386 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures related to competency to proceed, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Competency To Proceed And Restoration To Competency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1386 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1386 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1386, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1386, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1386, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1386 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1386 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1386, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1386, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1386, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-26 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |