CO HB1380 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Add In-home Support Servs Certain Medicaid Waivers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add In-home Support Servs Certain Medicaid Waivers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1380 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1380 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1380 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1380 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1380, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1380, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1380 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1380 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
2016-05-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2016-05-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-03HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-05-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-04-08HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-03-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D59FB5DD117116D87257F5C00654E31?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D59FB5DD117116D87257F5C00654E31/$FILE/1380_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D59FB5DD117116D87257F5C00654E31/$FILE/1380app_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D59FB5DD117116D87257F5C00654E31/$FILE/1380_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D59FB5DD117116D87257F5C00654E31/$FILE/1380_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C9472DB412365DB987257F8F00626152
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C9472DB412365DB987257F8F00626152
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EFD6F61016C3D14C87257FA800569384
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/50E32D856931C2F487257FA800569B60
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DD222C6AAFD1D2F987257FAA00685AD9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/75F01E42189DEC6587257FAA0067EB26
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/B6E013B81CE2868E87257FA900526200/$FILE/My04.pdf#1210
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DD222C6AAFD1D2F987257FAA00685AD9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/75F01E42189DEC6587257FAA0067EB26
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EFD6F61016C3D14C87257FA800569384
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/50E32D856931C2F487257FA800569B60

Bill Comments

feedback