CO HB1377 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments - Committee, Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments - Committee, Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Colorado Retirement Security Task Force
Title
Colorado Retirement Security Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment. Page 6 of the reengrossed bill, line 26, strike "A". Page 6, line 27, strike STRUCTURE and insert OR DEFINED BENEFIT STRUCTURES (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment L) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 This is a conceptual amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council The motion passed on a vote of 8-5. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment. Page 6 of the reengrossed bill, line 26, strike "A". Page 6, line 27, strike STRUCTURE and insert OR DEFINED BENEFIT STRUCTURES (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment L) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 This is a conceptual amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council The motion passed on a vote of 8-5. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1377, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-25 | House | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-23 | House | House Committee on Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2014-04-22 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |