CO HB1372 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an exemption from air emission limits for the use of a stationary engine to support critical infrastructure in emergencies.
Title
Emergency Engine Exemption Emission Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1372 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1372, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1372, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1372 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1372, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1372, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2022-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-27 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |