CO HB1367 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-14 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-14 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of the severance tax exemption for oil and gas wells that are stripper wells.
Title
Repeal Severance Tax Exemption for Stripper Wells
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Kipp [D] | Sen. Faith Winter [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1367 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1367 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1367 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2024-04-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance |
2024-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |