CO HB1349 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prop Tax Exempt Nonprofit Entity Fed Tax Credits
Title
Prop Tax Exempt Nonprofit Entity Fed Tax Credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1349 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1349 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1349 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-17 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2014-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-09 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |