CO HB1346 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation Of Corp Income Sheltered In Tax Haven
Title
Taxation Of Corp Income Sheltered In Tax Haven
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1346 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1346 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1346 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1346, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1346, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1346 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1346 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1346, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1346, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-22 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |