CO HB1344 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning relief from collateral consequences of criminal actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief From Criminal Collateral Consequences

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1344 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1344 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29 Governor Signed
2018-05-04 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2018-04-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-03-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1344
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1344_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1344_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1344_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1344_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1344_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1344_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2018a2018-04-12t133244z-hb18-1344-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1344vote55f45d
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sjud2018a2018-04-23t143810z-hb18-1344-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1344vote576daf

Bill Comments

feedback