CO HB1327 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning sports betting, and, in connection therewith, submitting to the registered electors of the state of Colorado a ballot measure authorizing the collection of a tax on the net proceeds of sports betting through licensed casinos, directing the revenues generated through collection of the sports betting tax to specified public purposes, including the state water plan through creation of the water plan implementation cash fund, and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize And Tax Sports Betting Refer Under Taxpayers' Bill Of Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1327, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1327 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.014) (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1327, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1327 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Governor Signed
2019-05-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-22HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1327
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1327_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1327_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1327_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1327_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1327_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1327_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/72a0753d12e7391f872583e400785f7f-hb19-1327-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d05bfc2ffbdc3b9e872583e5004f2310-hb19-1327-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d05bfc2ffbdc3b9e872583e5004f2310-hb19-1327-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1327vote64f431
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1327vote6506aa
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1327vote64e26a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/81429bb7ce7d5aba872583e90012ac80-hb19-1327-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/64943ac1535d2e64872583e900801173-hb19-1327-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/64943ac1535d2e64872583e900801173-hb19-1327-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1327vote6044fb

Bill Comments

feedback