CO HB1323 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning transfers of money to a newly created office of state planning and budgeting youth pay for success initiatives account within the pay for success contracts fund, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Pay For Success Contracts Pilot Program Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1323 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1323 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1323 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1323 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1323 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1323 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |