CO HB1321 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of an electronic device to verify the driver's license of a person who rents a motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Verification Of Identification For A Motor Vehicle Rental

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1321 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1321 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Governor Signed
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-17HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1321
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1321_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1321_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1321_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1321_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1321_rr2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1321_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/288dc50db143620d872583df006fc2f1-hb19-1321-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1321vote5582cd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f0e3d736866f9e37872583e700093a22-hb19-1321-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1321vote670d06

Bill Comments

feedback