CO HB1321 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning efficient administration of nonemergency medical transportation within the existing benefit under the medical assistance program, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Efficient Administration Medicaid Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.004) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1321 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1321 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1321 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.004) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1321 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1321 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1321 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |