CO HB1321 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Membership Task Force Drunk Impaired Driving

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Membership Task Force Drunk Impaired Driving

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06HouseGovernor Signed
2014-05-14HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-14HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-04-30HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2014-04-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-21SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2014-04-17SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-04-14SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2014-04-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-07HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-04-03HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-03-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/08F431088FD24A3487257C940059C454?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/08F431088FD24A3487257C940059C454/$FILE/1321_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/08F431088FD24A3487257C940059C454/$FILE/1321Transp__01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/08F431088FD24A3487257C940059C454/$FILE/1321_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/08F431088FD24A3487257C940059C454/$FILE/1321_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/08F431088FD24A3487257C940059C454/$FILE/1321sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/08F431088FD24A3487257C940059C454/$FILE/1321_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/08F431088FD24A3487257C940059C454/$FILE/1321_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/08F431088FD24A3487257C940059C454/$FILE/1321_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EFF752C98405351287257CAF0066F729
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/514D8F0390D6602D87257CAF0066D0A3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FDF8C53A9EAE4B0387257CBA00738B6F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6803B9850A6E1B7F87257CBA00735A4D

Bill Comments

feedback