CO HB1321 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modernization Of The State Personnel System Act
Title
Modernization Of The State Personnel System Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.024 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.024 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.022 (Attachment E) to House Bill 12-1321 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.021 (Attachment D) to House Bill 12-1321 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.022 (Attachment E) to House Bill 12-1321 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.021 (Attachment D) to House Bill 12-1321 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.024 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.022 (Attachment E) to House Bill 12-1321 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.021 (Attachment D) to House Bill 12-1321 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.022 (Attachment E) to House Bill 12-1321 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.021 (Attachment D) to House Bill 12-1321 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-02 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-04-18 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-13 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-10 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-03-23 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2012-03-21 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |