CO HB1321 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unif Serv Elector Verbal Ballot Request
Title
Unif Serv Elector Verbal Ballot Request
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1321 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1321 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1321 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1321 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1321 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1321 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1321 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1321 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1321 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1321 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1321 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-05-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2011-05-09 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-06 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-05-05 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |