CO HB1316 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Procurement Availability Utilization Analysis
Title
Procurement Availability Utilization Analysis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1316 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1316 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1316, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1316, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1316 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1316, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1316, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/02/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-04-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |