CO HB1316 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Oil Gas Commn Uniform Groundwater Sample Rule
Title
Oil Gas Commn Uniform Groundwater Sample Rule
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1316, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1316, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 8-5. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 8-5. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1316, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1316, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1316, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1316, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 8-5. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 8-5. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1316, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1316, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2013-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-25 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |