CO HB1314 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expanding the income tax credit for qualified costs incurred in preservation of historic structures, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Modification Tax Credit Preservation Historic Structures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1314 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1314 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1314, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1314, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1314 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1314 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1314, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1314, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |