CO HB1314 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oil & Gas Filing Exception
Title
Oil & Gas Filing Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1314, unamended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1314, unamended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1314 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment on page 13 lines 7 and 8 to insert the name of new office after strike "Governor's Energy Office" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Made a substitute motion to refer HB 12-1314 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1314 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment on page 13 lines 7 and 8 to insert the name of new office after strike "Governor's Energy Office" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Made a substitute motion to refer HB 12-1314 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1314, unamended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1314, unamended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1314 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment on page 13 lines 7 and 8 to insert the name of new office after strike "Governor's Energy Office" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Made a substitute motion to refer HB 12-1314 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1314 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment on page 13 lines 7 and 8 to insert the name of new office after strike "Governor's Energy Office" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Made a substitute motion to refer HB 12-1314 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2012-04-18 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2012-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-17 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-12 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-10 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |