CO HB1313 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the administration of ballots mailed to electors towards the end of the voting period.
Title
Administration Of Late Ballots
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Sullivan [D] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Governor Signed | |
2020-07-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-07-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-05-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |