CO HB1313 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Pending: Senate Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Pending: Senate Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning plans to reduce carbon dioxide emissions by qualifying retail utilities, and, in connection therewith, encouraging the achievement of zero carbon dioxide emissions by 2050 and making an appropriation.
Title
Electric Utility Plans To Further Reduce Carbon Dioxide Emissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1313 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.026) (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.029) (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I). (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1313 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.026) (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.029) (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I). (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-17 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |