CO HB1313 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the allowance of a pharmacist to serve as a practitioner under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists To Serve As Practitioners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1313 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.004 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06 Governor Signed
2018-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2018-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-03-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1313
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1313_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1313_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1313_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1313_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1313_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1313_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2018a2018-04-10t114715z-hb18-1313-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2018a2018-04-10t114715z-hb18-1313-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2018a2018-04-10t114715z-hb18-1313-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1313vote555e70
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-04-25t104827z-hb18-1313-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1313vote5eaf5b

Bill Comments

feedback