CO HB1313 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning civil forfeiture reform, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Forfeiture Reform

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Amendment J). (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment I). (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment H). (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment M). (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment P). (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment O). (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Governor Signed
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-05-10SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-05-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-05-08SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2017-05-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2017-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2017-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2017-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2017-04-20HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
2017-04-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1313
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1313_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1313_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1313_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1313_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1313_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1313_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-8-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-9-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-10-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1313-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-05-02t080552z-hb17-1313-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-05-02t080552z-hb17-1313-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-05-02t080552z-hb17-1313-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#1254
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-05-04t103847z-hb17-1313-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-05-08t083326z-hb17-1313-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-05-08t083326z-hb17-1313-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-05-04t103847z-hb17-1313-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback