CO HB1313 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rocky Mountain National Park License Plate
Title
Rocky Mountain National Park License Plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2015-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-16 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-02 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |