CO HB1311 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the institute of cannabis research at Colorado state university - Pueblo.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Institute Of Cannabis Research Role And Mission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1311 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1311, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1311, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Governor Signed
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1311
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1311_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1311_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1311_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1311_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1311_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1311_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/25f3a268a6f28fda872583dd0075d3f2-hb19-1311-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/25f3a268a6f28fda872583dd0075d3f2-hb19-1311-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/25f3a268a6f28fda872583dd0075d3f2-hb19-1311-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1311vote54d685
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/24db622a5a3316a5872583e7000d5ea4-hb19-1311-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1311vote6c1092

Bill Comments

feedback