CO HB1309 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health Insurance Coverage For Breast Imaging
Title
Health Insurance Coverage For Breast Imaging
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1309, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1309 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1309, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1309 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1309, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1309, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1309, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1309 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1309, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1309 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1309, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1309, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2013-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-23 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |