CO HB1308 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cell Phone Info To Police In Emergency Situation
Title
Cell Phone Info To Police In Emergency Situation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1308 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1308 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1308, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1308, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1308 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1308, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1308, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-23 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |