CO HB1304 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Priorities Community Conversations
Title
Transportation Priorities Community Conversations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1304 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1304 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1304 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1304 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1304 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1304 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1304 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1304 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1304 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-13 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-02-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |