CO HB1302 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Add Judgment Remedy In Fraudulent Transfer Action
Title
Add Judgment Remedy In Fraudulent Transfer Action
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1302 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1302, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1302, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-24 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |