CO HB1301 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tobacco Credit Shipped To Out-of-state Consumers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco Credit Shipped To Out-of-state Consumers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1301 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1301 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1301, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment M) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment to change the reference to the "Business Affairs & Labor Committee" to "Finance Committee" The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1301 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05HouseGovernor Signed
2015-05-18HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-18HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-07HouseSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2015-05-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-05SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-04SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-04-30SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2015-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-22HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-03-26HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Finance
2015-03-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9C3AB04FE95435C987257DCD00649666?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9C3AB04FE95435C987257DCD00649666/$FILE/1301_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9C3AB04FE95435C987257DCD00649666/$FILE/1301fin_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9C3AB04FE95435C987257DCD00649666/$FILE/1301app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9C3AB04FE95435C987257DCD00649666/$FILE/1301_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9C3AB04FE95435C987257DCD00649666/$FILE/1301_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9C3AB04FE95435C987257DCD00649666/$FILE/1301_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9C3AB04FE95435C987257DCD00649666/$FILE/1301_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/9C3AB04FE95435C987257DCD00649666/$FILE/1301_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A4BBF5E19BBF61AC87257E14006D43C1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1DC7DBC0A0EC77D687257E2F007F244A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1DC7DBC0A0EC77D687257E2F007F244A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B1DBA5F5214649B687257E2F007EB54B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A75DE37FC8EE7BC887257E2F007ED625
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E72D9D08A100A9B187257E36004E4D7A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B265499CB5F9A84687257E36004E5469
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DDDAD2F502FC289987257E3900018DCA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DA045C5818953AFB87257E3B006BBFCD

Bill Comments

feedback