CO HB1287 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning achieving a vision for education in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Achieving A Vision For Education In Colorado
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1287, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1287 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1287 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1287, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1287, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1287, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1287 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1287 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1287, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1287, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1287, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-10 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |