CO HB1286 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increase Wildfire Mitigation Income Tax Deduction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase Wildfire Mitigation Income Tax Deduction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1286 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1286 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1286 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1286 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1286 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1286 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1286 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1286 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-10HouseGovernor Signed
2016-05-18HouseSent to the Governor
2016-05-17HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-05-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-05SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-05-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2016-05-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-03HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-09HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-02-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/53316973373AE85C87257F46006AC213?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/53316973373AE85C87257F46006AC213/$FILE/1286_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/53316973373AE85C87257F46006AC213/$FILE/1286_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/53316973373AE85C87257F46006AC213/$FILE/1286_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/53316973373AE85C87257F46006AC213/$FILE/1286_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/53316973373AE85C87257F46006AC213/$FILE/1286_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/53316973373AE85C87257F46006AC213/$FILE/1286_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/53316973373AE85C87257F46006AC213/$FILE/1286_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9CEF2224BD50875F87257F710077E4E0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9CEF2224BD50875F87257F710077E4E0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/53C8C1F00DC906F987257FA800560AEF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/ADE7200687B218EB87257FAA00698F52
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F6E216B09EDFE70087257FAA0078ACC2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/B6E013B81CE2868E87257FA900526200/$FILE/My04.pdf#1208
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/8F99E24A02FCBC0287257FAB004DBC4C/$FILE/jour_115.pdf#1116
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/ADE7200687B218EB87257FAA00698F52
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/53C8C1F00DC906F987257FA800560AEF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F6E216B09EDFE70087257FAA0078ACC2

Bill Comments

feedback