CO HB1285 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the motorcycle operator safety training program, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Motorcycle Operator Safety Training Program
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Sullivan [D] | Sen. Mike Foote [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1285 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1285 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1285 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1285 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1285 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1285 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Governor Signed | |
2020-07-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-07-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-06-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |