CO HB1285 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning parking for people with certain disabilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Remuneration-exempt Disability Parking Placard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1285 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1285 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.003) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1285, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1285, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1285 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1285 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.003) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1285, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1285, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |