CO HB1282 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes Of Deception & Lying In Birth Certificates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes Of Deception & Lying In Birth Certificates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed on a vote of 4-1. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05HouseGovernor Signed
2015-05-18HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-18HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-04HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-04-27SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2015-04-21HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-20HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-14HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-03-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/010C6B14FF7C9A3C87257DE2005A622B?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/010C6B14FF7C9A3C87257DE2005A622B/$FILE/1282_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/010C6B14FF7C9A3C87257DE2005A622B/$FILE/1282jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/010C6B14FF7C9A3C87257DE2005A622B/$FILE/1282_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/010C6B14FF7C9A3C87257DE2005A622B/$FILE/1282_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/010C6B14FF7C9A3C87257DE2005A622B/$FILE/1282ssta_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/010C6B14FF7C9A3C87257DE2005A622B/$FILE/1282_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/010C6B14FF7C9A3C87257DE2005A622B/$FILE/1282_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/010C6B14FF7C9A3C87257DE2005A622B/$FILE/1282_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3BCDDBB600A2933387257E280001D7E7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/536B8BD777B8D67987257E3500043DCD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3BCDDBB600A2933387257E280001D7E7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6C911A29B1E5BC0F87257E2800008057
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BA3D5BE3BFABFC3287257E3500031DA2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2FD9D52645BFC09E87257E3500032599

Bill Comments

feedback