CO HB1281 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Management Info System Approp Two Years
Title
Medicaid Management Info System Approp Two Years
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Gerou [R] | Sen. Mary Hodge [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1281 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1281 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1281 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1281 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1281 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1281 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1281 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-11 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2013-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-09 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |