CO HB1280 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning authorizing the department of higher education to collect the data necessary to calculate return on investment metrics related to student outcomes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDHE Data For Student Return On Investment Metrics

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 20-1280 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1280 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-11SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2020-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-25HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-20HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1280
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1280_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1280_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1280_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1280_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1280_rr2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1280_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fcca7bbbf604885c872585140078b7e0-hb20-1280-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1280vote5b3bdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cc4cc5b4846b2def87258528005ec9ef-hb20-1280-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1280vote54a915

Bill Comments

feedback