CO HB1280 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning conforming Colorado statutory language related to disability trusts to the federal '21st Century Cures Act'.
Title
Disability Trusts 21st Century Cures Act Language
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1280 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation for the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1280 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation for the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2017-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |