CO HB1280 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agritourism Limited Civil Liablity
Title
Agritourism Limited Civil Liablity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2014-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2014-03-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |