CO HB1275 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning additional measures to increase waste diversion, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Increase Solid Waste Diversion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1275 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1275, as amended, to the Committee of on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1275, as amended, to the Committee of on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1275, as amended, to the Committee of on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1275, as amended, to the Committee of on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |